Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Jacques Chapt de Rastignac

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690¹Born
29 Dec 172030.9SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
24 Sep 172131.7ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
1 Feb 172232.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
26 Oct 172333.8SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
27 Sep 172434.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
2 Aug 175060.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jacques Chapt de Rastignac
Archbishop Louis-Jacques Chapt de Rastignac (born 1690, died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorgnac

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 395, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast