Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Marie-Etienne-Gustave Ardin

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1840BornClairvaux-les-Lacs
21 May 186423.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 188039.1SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
27 Feb 188039.2ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
1 May 188039.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
21 Feb 188443.1SelectedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
27 Mar 188443.2ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
2 Apr 189251.3SelectedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
11 Jul 189251.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
21 Nov 191170.9DiedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Etienne-Gustave Ardin:
Archbishop Pierre-Marie-Etienne-Gustave Ardin (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 426, and Page 488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013