Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Katiola

Dioecesis Katiolaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ignace Bessi Dogbo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Korhogo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Côte d’Ivoire
  • Square Kilometers: 32,835 (12,682 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 110, Katiola, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 31.66.04.35
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Korhogo
17 November 1911ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio Prefecture Apostolic of Korhogo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Katiola
15 May 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Korhogo Vicariate Apostolic of Katiola
Diocese of Katiola
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Katiola Diocese of Katiola
13 September 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Abidjan
Diocese of Bouaké
Diocese of Katiola
Diocese of Abengourou (erected)
15 October 1971Territory LostDiocese of Katiola Diocese of Korhogo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Korhogo
194911,0211,000,0001.1%22225001710ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Katiola
Diocese of Katiola
197026,329642,3434.1%83240658423916ap1971
198028,900312,0009.3%522271,07026175ap1981
199037,170354,50010.5%818261,429212614ap1991
199948,942490,00010.0%917261,882212816ap2000
200048,935498,0009.8%1415291,687182817ap2001
200149,655498,00010.0%1815331,504192817ap2002
200251,075544,7769.4%2714411,245222518ap2004
200652,124547,2519.5%329411,271132520ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011