Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Armand de Bessuéjouls Roquelaure

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1721Born
17 Mar 175433.0SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
20 May 175433.2ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
16 Jun 175433.3Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
21 Sep 180180.5ResignedBishop of Senlis, France
12 Apr 180281.1SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
14 Apr 180281.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
25 Mar 180887.0RetiredArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
23 Apr 181897.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Armand de Bessuéjouls Roquelaure (VIAF: 9838268)
Archbishop Jean-Armand de Bessuéjouls Roquelaure (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLassouts, France

  • a bishop for 63.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,754, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast