Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Auguste-René-Marie Cardinal Dubourg

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1842Born
22 Dec 186624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
14 Jan 189350.2SelectedBishop of Moulins, France
19 Jan 189350.3ConfirmedBishop of Moulins, France
16 Apr 189350.5Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
6 Aug 190663.8AppointedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
4 Dec 191674.1Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191674.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
22 Sep 192178.9DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-René-Marie Dubourg (VIAF: 66599854)
Auguste-René-Marie Cardinal Dubourg (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoguivy-Plougras, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Death PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017