Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore Legain

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1809Born
3 Nov 183323.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 187161.4SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
24 May 187161.5ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
25 Jul 187161.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
21 Apr 188171.4DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Théodore Legain (VIAF: 22133741)
Bishop Théodore Legain (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÉpeugney
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montauban, Diocese of Montauban

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,871, Number 22
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,025, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast