Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome M. Fernandez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quilon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1901BornKoivila
24 Mar 192826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Quilon, India
25 Sep 193736.0AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
12 Dec 193736.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quilon, India
30 Jan 197876.4RetiredBishop of Quilon, India
27 Feb 199290.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Jerome M. Fernandez:
Bishop Jerome M. Fernandez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quilon

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 54.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013