Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Malayappan Chinnappa, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1937 Born
16 Dec 197235.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Nov 199356.3AppointedBishop of Vellore, India
25 Jan 199456.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vellore, India
1 Apr 200567.6AppointedArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
21 Nov 201275.3RetiredArchbishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India

MicroData Summary for Malayappan Chinnappa
Archbishop Malayappan Chinnappa S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyandur-Mugaiyur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,419
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018