Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Pius Dorairaj

Bishop of Dharmapuri, India

Apostolic Administrator of Salem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1954 Born
28 Dec 198127.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 199844.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
28 Nov 199844.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Absa Salla
21 Feb 199944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Absa Salla
13 Jan 201257.5AppointedBishop of Dharmapuri, India
9 Mar 202065.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Salem, India

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Pius Dorairaj
Bishop Lawrence Pius Dorairaj (born ) Bishop of Dharmapuri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChennai
Ordained BishopOpen Air, St. Bede's School, Madras, Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dharmapuri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,483
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2012
  • ab: CB, 9 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast