Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Madurai

Archidioecesis Madhuraiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Fernando, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 8,910 (3,441 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofmadurai.org/
  • Mailing Address: Kosakulam Pudur, Madurai-625007, India
  • Telephone: (0452)563.330; 566.198
  • Fax: 566.630

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Madura
8 January 1938ErectedDiocese of Trichinopoly Diocese of Madura (erected)
Diocese of Madurai
21 October 1950Name ChangedDiocese of Madura Diocese of Madurai
Archdiocese of Madurai
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Madurai Archdiocese of Madurai
17 May 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Madurai Diocese of Palayamkottai (erected)
3 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Madurai Diocese of Sivagangai (erected)
10 November 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Madurai
Diocese of Tiruchirapalli
Diocese of Dindigul (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Madurai
1969253,0467,115,2923.6%99861851,36722685384ap1971
1980242,5004,994,8504.9%83991821,33222495073ap1981
1990137,5923,172,6254.3%6510116682822690852ap1991
1999297,0325,793,9545.1%75991741,70723978560ap2000
2000299,4286,395,2444.7%771141911,56726982162ap2001
2001300,2445,889,3205.1%801041841,63122779564ap2002
2002304,1425,954,8585.1%761121881,61718686665ap2003
2003308,4505,997,8605.1%821061881,64025685265ap2004
2004170,0005,495,8003.1%7812019885831398959ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013