Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Savarinathan Michael Augustine

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1933Born
15 Apr 196127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
30 Jan 197844.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
30 Jan 197844.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
29 Mar 197844.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
19 Jun 198148.0AppointedBishop of Vellore, India
18 Feb 199258.6AppointedArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
25 Jun 199259.0InstalledArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
10 Jun 200470.9ResignedArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
4 Nov 201784.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India

MicroData Summary for Savarinathan Michael Augustine
Archbishop Savarinathan Michael Augustine (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKovilanur
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Pondicherry, Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore
Ordained BishopMylapore, Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)
Death PlacePondicherry, Archdiocese of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • fn/d: CB, 4 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 21 Nov 2017