Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amalraj Arulappan

Bishop of Ootacamund


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1953 BornCoonoor
26 Dec 198027.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 200652.5AppointedBishop of Ootacamund, India
9 Aug 200652.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ootacamund, India

MicroData Summary for Amalraj Arulappan:
Bishop Amalraj Arulappan (born ) Bishop of Ootacamund

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ootacamund.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015