Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Heskett, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1953 Born
28 Aug 197118.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Jul 197623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Mar 201057.0AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
10 Jul 201057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
20 May 201461.2AppointedBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain
10 Jul 201461.3InstalledBishop of Hallam, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Heskett
Bishop Ralph Heskett C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Hallam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSunderland, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained PriestSt. Benet, Church, Sunderland, Tyne and Wear, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopNorth Front Hangar, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hallam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,757
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • op.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast