Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Christopher Budd

Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1937 Born
8 Jul 196225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 198548.4AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 198648.6Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 201376.4RetiredBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Christopher Budd
Bishop Hugh Christopher Budd (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRomford, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSts. Mary and Boniface, Cathedral, Plymouth, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Plymouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2013
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast