Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Rapallo

Deceased

Bishop of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1914BornGibraltar
7 Nov 193723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gibraltar
5 Jul 197359.2AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
7 Oct 197359.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
6 Feb 198469.8DiedBishop of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Edward Rapallo:
Bishop Edward Rapallo (born , died ) Bishop of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 148, Number 529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015