Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cormac Cardinal Murphy-O’Connor

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1932Born
28 Oct 195624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 197745.2AppointedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 197745.3Ordained BishopBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 200067.4AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 200067.5InstalledArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
21 Feb 200168.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200168.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
20 Oct 200169.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
3 Apr 200976.6RetiredArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
1 Sep 201785.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Cormac Murphy-O’Connor (VIAF: 103794611)
Cormac Cardinal Murphy-O’Connor (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReading, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arundel, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England
Death PlaceRoyal Marsden Hospital, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
  • a cardinal for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2009
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • dp: CL, 9 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Sep 2017