Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Antony Moran

Bishop Emeritus of Aberdeen, Scotland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1935 BornGlasgow
19 Mar 195923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
198650.7IncardinatedPriest of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Oct 200368.5AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Dec 200368.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Jun 201176.1RetiredBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter Antony Moran:
Bishop Peter Antony Moran (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aberdeen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aberdeen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013