Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sándor Kovács

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1893Born
14 Oct 191522.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 194450.7AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
25 Mar 194450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
8 Feb 197278.6RetiredBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
24 Dec 197279.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Sándor Kovács
Bishop Sándor Kovács (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKecskemét

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast