Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Imre Timkó

Deceased

Bishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

Apostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1920Born
8 Dec 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
7 Jan 197554.4AppointedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
7 Jan 197554.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
8 Feb 197554.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
30 Mar 198867.6DiedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Imre Timkó (VIAF: 29553369)
Bishop Imre Timkó (born , died ) Bishop of Hajdúdorog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 25 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast