Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sándor Klempa, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Veszprém, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Basti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1898Born
27 Aug 192224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
195960.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Veszprém, Hungary
8 Feb 197273.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
8 Feb 197273.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Veszprém, Hungary
16 Mar 197273.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti
19 Dec 198587.6DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Sándor Klempa
Bishop Sándor Klempa O. Praem. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast