Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Udvardy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1911BornBácsalmás
25 Oct 193625.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 196957.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Csanád, Hungary
10 Jan 196957.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
12 Feb 196958.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
7 Jan 197563.9AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
5 Jun 198776.3RetiredBishop of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary
10 Jan 200088.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Udvardy:
Bishop József Udvardy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Szeged-Csanád

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013