Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gyula Szakos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1916Born
9 Jul 193922.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 197962.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
31 Mar 197962.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rapidum
30 Apr 197962.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rapidum
5 Apr 198265.6AppointedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
13 Sep 199175.0RetiredBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
20 Jun 199275.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyula Szakos
Bishop Gyula Szakos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSótony

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast