Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Izidor István Marosi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1916Born
22 Jun 194125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
31 Mar 197963.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
31 Mar 197963.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
30 Apr 197963.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
3 Mar 198770.9AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
11 Feb 199275.8RetiredBishop of Vác, Hungary
14 Nov 200387.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Izidor István Marosi
Bishop Izidor István Marosi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUjkécske

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2004, Page 1,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017