Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neethinathan Anthonisamy

Bishop of Chingleput, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1955 Born
9 May 198731.8Ordained PriestPriest of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor), India
19 Jul 200247.0AppointedBishop of Chingleput, India
29 Sep 200247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chingleput, India

MicroData Summary for Neethinathan Anthonisamy
Bishop Neethinathan Anthonisamy (born ) Bishop of Chingleput

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKakkanur
Ordained BishopChinglepet, Diocese of Chingleput

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chingleput.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,257
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast