Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Roy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mysore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1925BornMysore
19 Dec 195328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mysore, India
19 Dec 199469.2AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
21 Feb 199569.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
12 Feb 200377.3RetiredBishop of Mysore, India
18 Apr 200478.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Roy:
Bishop Joseph Roy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,490
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013