Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Cassidy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1933Born
21 Jun 195925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
24 Aug 197945.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
23 Sep 197945.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
1 May 198248.5SucceededBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
22 Aug 198753.8AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
28 Jun 199460.6ResignedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
31 Jan 201379.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cassidy
Archbishop Joseph Cassidy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharlestown

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 31 Jan 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast