Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Flynn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1931Born
17 Jun 195624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
30 Dec 197645.4AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
20 Feb 197745.6Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
20 Nov 200776.3RetiredBishop of Achonry, Ireland
2 Jun 201583.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Flynn
Bishop Thomas Flynn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Achonry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallaghaderreen

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2007
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast