Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donal Brendan Murray

Bishop Emeritus of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1940 Born
22 May 196625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
4 Mar 198241.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
4 Mar 198241.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
18 Apr 198241.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
10 Feb 199655.6AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
17 Dec 200969.5ResignedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Donal Brendan Murray (VIAF: 70337676)
Bishop Donal Brendan Murray (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limerick.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017