Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Séamus Hegarty

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1940Born
19 Jun 196626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Raphoe, Ireland
12 Feb 198242.0AppointedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
28 Mar 198242.1Ordained BishopBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
1 Oct 199454.6AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
23 Nov 201171.8ResignedBishop of Derry, Ireland
20 Sep 201979.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Séamus Hegarty
Bishop Séamus Hegarty (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilcar, Co. Donegal, Diocese of Raphoe
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick, College, Maynooth, Co. Kildare, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopSt Eunan and St. Columba, Cathedral, Letterkenny, Co. Donegal, Diocese of Raphoe
Death PlaceLetterkenny University, Hospital, Letterkenny, Diocese of Raphoe
Buried Place (Original)Grounds of, St. Eugene’s, Cathedral, Derry, Diocese of Derry

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2011
  • d: CB, 20 Sep 2019
  • loc: CL, 26 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Sep 2019

Quantcast