Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Gerard Brooks

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dromore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1924BornRathfriland
19 Jun 194925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dromore, Ireland
20 Nov 197551.8AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
25 Jan 197652.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
4 Jun 199975.4RetiredBishop of Dromore, Ireland
4 Sep 201086.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Francis Gerard Brooks:
Bishop Francis Gerard Brooks (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dromore

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013