Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Walsh

Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1931 Born
25 Feb 195624.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 198351.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Apr 198351.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cr
15 May 198352.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cr
18 Mar 199159.9AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Feb 200876.8RetiredBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Walsh
Bishop Patrick Joseph Walsh (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCobh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Down and Connor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018