Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eamon Casey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1927Born
17 Jun 195124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
17 Jul 196942.2AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
9 Nov 196942.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry, Ireland
21 Jul 197649.2AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
6 May 199265.0ResignedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
13 Mar 201789.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Eamon Casey (VIAF: 63215027)
Bishop Eamon Casey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiries, Diocese of Kerry
Death PlaceCarrigoran Nursing Home, Newmarket-on-Fergus, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Our Lady Assumed into Heaven & St. Nicholas, Cathedral, Galway, Diocese of Galway and Kilmacduagh

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Mar 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast