Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Tacci (Porcelli)

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1863Born
18 Sep 188622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fermo, Italy
18 Mar 189531.3AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
5 May 189531.4Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
17 Dec 190441.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
19 Dec 190441.1AppointedApostolic Delegate of the Roman Curia - Other
31 Dec 190744.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
29 Apr 191147.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
8 Dec 191653.0AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
30 Oct 191854.9AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
13 Jun 192157.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 192157.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
8 Aug 192258.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
29 Jan 192763.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
30 Jun 192864.6DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tacci (Porcelli) (VIAF: 193070455)
Giovanni Cardinal Tacci (Porcelli) (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogliano, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propagation of the Faith sepulchre, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
  • a cardinal for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 31
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017