Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Buckley

Bishop of Cork and Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1939 BornInchigeela
20 Jun 196525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cork and Ross, Ireland
16 Mar 198444.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
16 Mar 198444.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
29 Apr 198444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
19 Dec 199758.1AppointedBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland
8 Feb 199858.2InstalledBishop of Cork and Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Buckley:
Bishop John Buckley (born ) Bishop of Cork and Ross

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cork and Ross.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015