Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Desmond Cardinal Connell

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1926Born
19 May 195125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
21 Jan 198861.8AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
6 Mar 198861.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Feb 200174.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200174.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
26 Apr 200478.0RetiredArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
21 Feb 201790.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Desmond Connell (VIAF: 54995979)
Desmond Cardinal Connell (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopPro-Cathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
  • a cardinal for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,435
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Jul 2018

Quantcast