Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dermot Clifford

Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1939 BornBallymacelligott
22 Feb 196425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry, Ireland
17 Dec 198546.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
9 Mar 198647.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
12 Sep 198849.6SucceededArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
7 Mar 200970.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cloyne, Ireland
24 Nov 201273.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Cloyne, Ireland
22 Nov 201475.8RetiredArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Dermot Clifford:
Archbishop Dermot Clifford (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014