Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Ryan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1931Born
17 Jun 195625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
17 Jul 198453.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
9 Sep 198453.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
10 Dec 198756.5SucceededBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
4 Jun 200271.0ResignedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
13 Oct 200372.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Laurence Ryan
Bishop Laurence Ryan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallyerinningan

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast