Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Newman

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1926Born
18 Jun 195024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
17 May 197448.1AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
14 Jul 197448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
3 Apr 199569.0DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Newman
Bishop Jeremiah Newman (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast