Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Anthony Finnegan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1925Born
17 Jun 195125.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 198761.6AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
12 Jul 198761.8Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
19 Feb 200276.4RetiredBishop of Killala, Ireland
25 Dec 201186.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Killala, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony Finnegan
Bishop Thomas Anthony Finnegan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Killala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlerea

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Website of the Diocese, 26 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast