Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony J. Farquhar

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Hermiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1940 Born
13 Mar 196524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Apr 198342.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Apr 198342.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermiana
15 May 198342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermiana
3 Dec 201575.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Anthony J. Farquhar
Bishop Anthony J. Farquhar (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelfast

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Down and Connor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast