Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Avelar Cardinal Brandão Vilela

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1912Born
27 Oct 193523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Aracajú, Brazil
13 Jun 194634.0AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Oct 194634.3Ordained BishopBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
5 Nov 195543.3AppointedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
25 Mar 197158.7AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
5 Mar 197360.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197360.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
19 Dec 198674.5DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Avelar Brandão Vilela (VIAF: 88695947)
Avelar Cardinal Brandão Vilela (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViçosa
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Aracajú, Diocese of Aracajú

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 89
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast