Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel de Lima Valverde

Deceased

Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1872Born
30 Mar 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
6 Feb 191138.3AppointedBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
29 Oct 191139.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Feb 192249.3AppointedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 May 195178.6DiedArchbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Lima Valverde
Archbishop Miguel de Lima Valverde (born , died ) Archbishop of Olinda e Recife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Amaro

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast