Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin de Souza Gomes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1911Born
8 Dec 194130.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 196856.2AppointedBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
9 Jun 196856.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
12 Oct 198573.8RetiredBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
17 Nov 199583.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benjamin de Souza Gomes
Bishop Benjamin de Souza Gomes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paranavaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOurinçangas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sorocaba, Diocese of Sorocaba

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast