Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife

Archidioecesis Olindensis et Recifensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 26 July 1918
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Pernambuco
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 4,058 (1,567 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 2
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidioceseolindarecife.org/
  • Mailing Address: Av. Rui Barbosa 409, Gracas, 52011-040 Recife, PE, Brazil
  • Telephone: (081)3271-4270
  • Fax: 3222-6536

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Pernambuco
1614Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Pernambuco Apostolic Administration of São Luís do Maranhão (erected)
15 July 1614ErectedDiocese of São Salvador da Bahia de Todos os Santos Territorial Prelature of Pernambuco (erected)
Diocese of Olinda
16 November 1676ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Pernambuco Diocese of Olinda
6 June 1854Territory LostDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará) (erected)
27 April 1892Territory LostDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Paraíba (erected)
2 July 1900Territory LostDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Alagôas (erected)
5 December 1910Territory LostDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Floresta (erected)
Archdiocese of Olinda
5 December 1910ElevatedDiocese of Olinda Archdiocese of Olinda
Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife
26 July 1918Name ChangedArchdiocese of Olinda Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife
2 August 1918Territory LostArchdiocese of Olinda e Recife Diocese of Garanhuns (erected)
Diocese of Nazaré (erected)
7 August 1948Territory LostArchdiocese of Olinda e Recife Diocese of Caruaru (erected)
13 January 1962Territory LostDiocese of Garanhuns
Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife
Diocese of Palmares (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Olinda e Recife
1949973,842990,00098.4%741422164,50827088247ap1951
19651,320,0001061963024,37032085068ap1967*
19681,760,796.0%113185298033293066ap1971
19762,123,1602,374,92989.4%861442309,23123684871ap1977
19802,330,0002,600,00089.6%8113721810,6882631,01372ap1981
19902,994,0003,341,63589.6%7514321813,73327599582ap1991
19993,119,0003,350,00093.1%7112319416,07723455094ap2000
20003,083,0003,311,29093.1%8612921514,339228849996ap2001
20013,311,290.0%901352250229364097ap2002*
20023,127,0003,358,00093.1%8814022813,71424355297ap2003
20033,127,0003,311,29094.4%8914123013,595123941899ap2004
20043,371,9753,570,70394.4%8914123014,660823733199ap2005
20133,777,0003,996,00094.5%12415127513,73423251965109ap2014
20163,868,0004,092,00094.5%9216025215,34949284936123ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast