Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ângelo Domingos Salvador, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1932 Born
22 Mar 195825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Mar 198148.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
16 Mar 198148.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
14 Jun 198148.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
16 May 198653.8AppointedPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
17 Jul 199159.0AppointedBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 May 199966.8AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jun 200774.9RetiredBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ângelo Domingos Salvador
Bishop Ângelo Domingos Salvador O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Uruguaiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegredo
Ordained BishopVacaria, Diocese of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uruguaiana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast