Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valter Magno de Carvalho

Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Giufi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1973 Born
19 Oct 199623.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Aug 199724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Nov 202047.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
4 Nov 202047.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Giufi
23 Jan 202147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giufi

MicroData Summary for Valter Magno de Carvalho
Bishop Valter Magno de Carvalho (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapela Nova, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained DeaconMariana, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained PriestPalmital dos Carvalhos, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopSão José Operário, Basilica, Barbacena

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2020
  • od/c01: CB, 4 Nov 2020
  • nm/ob: CB, 5 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 5 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Jan 2021

Quantcast