Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hélio Pereira dos Santos

Coadjutor Bishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1967 Born
27 Dec 199528.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
19 Dec 199629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
27 Apr 201648.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
27 Apr 201648.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
22 Jul 201648.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiava
16 Oct 202052.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Serrinha, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hélio Pereira dos Santos
Bishop Hélio Pereira dos Santos (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Serrinha

EventPlace
Birth PlacePão de Açúcar, Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palmeira dos Índios, Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Serrinha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 27 Apr 2016
  • c23: CB, 23 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,064
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 16 Oct 2020

Quantcast