Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Maximilian Vaccano

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1609³BornGorizia
19 Oct 164636.9SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 Mar 164939.3ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
6 Nov 166253.0SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
12 Mar 166353.3ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
15 Aug 167262.8DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Maximilian Vaccano:
Bishop Franz Maximilian Vaccano (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277, and Page 330
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 379, and Page 381
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015