Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anton von Delmestri von Schönberg

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1672³BornCormons
26 Jan 169825.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trieste, Italy
9 Feb 169825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trieste, Italy
24 Jul 171744.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Trieste, Italy
11 May 171845.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Trieste, Italy
11 May 171845.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
28 Aug 171845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
23 Apr 172047.3SucceededBishop of Trieste, Italy
28 Oct 172047.8InstalledBishop of Trieste, Italy
19 Feb 172148.2DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anton von Delmestri von Schönberg:
Bishop Joseph Anton von Delmestri von Schönberg (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82, and Page 371
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015