Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Marenzi

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1596BornTrieste
30 Jan 163538.4SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
17 Aug 163740.9ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
17 Oct 163842.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
26 Apr 164649.6SelectedBishop of Trieste, Italy
10 Sep 164650.0ConfirmedBishop of Trieste, Italy
22 Oct 166266.1DiedBishop of Trieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Marenzi:
Bishop Antonio Marenzi (born , died ) Bishop of Trieste

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 277, and Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 102, Number 617

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013